11321 Cases | Kettering Municipal Judgements
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
24CVF03448 | ZACHARY LAFFERTY | 1/28/2025 | |||||||
MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC vs ZACHARY LAFFERTY | |||||||||
24CVF03590 | PAM KEENE | 1/28/2025 | |||||||
MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC vs PAM KEENE | |||||||||
24CVF04465 | SETH A ELMORE | 1/28/2025 | |||||||
LENDMARK FINANCIAL SERVICES LLC vs SETH A ELMORE | |||||||||
24CVF03395 | JASMINE RAINES | 1/28/2025 | |||||||
MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC vs JASMINE RAINES | |||||||||
24CVF03818 | MICHAEL EARL | 1/27/2025 | |||||||
LVNV FUNDING LLC vs MICHAEL EARL | |||||||||
24CVF03470 | KENYA COMPTON | 1/23/2025 | |||||||
BCG EQUITIES, LLC vs KENYA COMPTON | |||||||||
24CVF03941 | RICHARD M SHORT JR. | 1/23/2025 | |||||||
EAGLE FINANCIAL SERVICES INC. vs RICHARD M SHORT Jr. | |||||||||
24CVF04192 | DAREK DENNISON | 1/23/2025 | |||||||
EAGLE LOAN COMPANY OF OHIO INC vs DAREK DENNISON | |||||||||
24CVF03474 | ANGELA L MARTIN | 1/22/2025 | |||||||
JPMORGAN CHASE BANK NA vs ANGELA L MARTIN | |||||||||
24CVF02699 | NICOLE M MAZZOLA | 1/21/2025 | |||||||
DISCOVER BANK vs NICOLE M MAZZOLA | |||||||||
24CVF03710 | MARTINI MARCELO | 1/21/2025 | |||||||
LVNV FUNDING LLC vs MARTINI MARCELO | |||||||||
24CVF03558 | MEREDITH FREUDENBERG | 1/21/2025 | |||||||
MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC vs MEREDITH FREUDENBERG | |||||||||
24CVF03083 | TIMOTHY BURNS | 1/16/2025 | |||||||
CITIBANK, N.A. vs TIMOTHY BURNS | |||||||||
24CVF03107 | STEVEN WILLIAMS | 1/16/2025 | |||||||
CITIBANK, N.A. vs STEVEN WILLIAMS | |||||||||
24CVF03502 | STELIOS TSAPPAS | 1/16/2025 | |||||||
CITIBANK, N.A. vs STELIOS TSAPPAS | |||||||||
24CVF03044 | RICKY BUCHANAN | 1/15/2025 | |||||||
SPRING OAKS CAPITAL SPV, LLC vs RICKY BUCHANAN | |||||||||
24CVF03205 | ERICA FRANKLIN | 1/15/2025 | |||||||
LVNV FUNDING LLC C/O RESURGENT CAPITAL SERVICES L vs ERICA FRANKLIN | |||||||||
24CVF03271 | IBTAHAJ FAROOQ | 1/15/2025 | |||||||
JPMORGAN CHASE BANK NA vs IBTAHAJ FAROOQ | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 22, 23, 24 ... 565, 566, 567 Next |