Daily Law Journal
10081 Cases | Kettering Municipal Judgements
Case Number Defendant Date
24CVF02329 CHRISTINA N MARSHALL 3/25/2024
JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A. C/O LYONS, DOUGHTY & VELDHUIS, P vs CHRISTINA N MARSHAL...
23CVF02831 GARY M HONIOUS 3/25/2024
EAGLE LOAN COMPANY OF OHIO, INC vs GARY M HONIOUS
23CVF02869 DARRELL MALONE 3/25/2024
CKS PRIME INVESTMENTS, LLC vs DARRELL MALONE
23CVF04094 TAYLOR BRACKNEY 3/22/2024
MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC. vs TAYLOR BRACKNEY
23CVF03477 KATHERINE E LARAVIE 3/22/2024
TD BANK USA, N.A. C/O TARGET ENTERPRISE, INC vs KATHERINE E LARAVIE
23CVF03596 KRISTINA KLAWONN 3/22/2024
CAPITAL ONE , N.A. C/O LYONS, DOUGHTY, & VELDHUIS, vs KRISTINA KLAWONN
24CVF02079 ASHLEIGH HUBBS 3/22/2024
CAVALRY SPV I, LLC C/O LEVY & ASSOCIATES LLC vs ASHLEIGH HUBBS
23CVF03531 STEPHEN RAY SMITH 3/21/2024
EAGLE LOAN COMPANY OF OHIO, INC vs STEPHEN RAY SMITH
24CVF02102 BARBARA KOOSER 3/21/2024
JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS, LLC vs BARBARA KOOSER
23CVF03860 JESSE LEFFORGE 3/21/2024
LVNV FUNDING LLC vs JESSE LEFFORGE
23CVF03483 PAIGE BELL 3/20/2024
MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC vs PAIGE BELL
23CVI04078 A.D.KISTLER & SON 3/20/2024
SAMUEL ISON vs A.D.KISTLER & SON
23CVF03446 DOUGLAS SHINDELDECKER 3/20/2024
CAPITAL ONE, N.A. C/O LYONS, DOUGHTY & VELDHUIS PC vs DOUGLAS SHINDELDECKER
24CVF02453 LYNNEE D ROBERTS 3/20/2024
EAGLE FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC. vs LYNNEE D ROBERTS
23CVF03901 NACOLE L HINES 3/20/2024
TRIHEALTH INC C/O RACHEL J MASON vs NACOLE L HINES
23CVF03792 BRYON M. WELLS 3/18/2024
DOVETREE APARTMENTS vs BRYON M. WELLS
23CVI03751 STEPHANIE HARPER 3/15/2024
COLDWELL BANKER HERITAGE vs STEPHANIE HARPER
24CVI02011 DANNY ALLEY JR. 3/15/2024
PEGGY HUNTER vs DANNY ALLEY Jr.
23CVF02585 BRANDON JEWELL 3/14/2024
EAGLE LOAN COMPANY OF OHIO vs BRANDON JEWELL

Previous  1, 2, 3, ... 503, 504, 505  Next