16228 Cases | Kettering Municipal Assignments
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
21CVF03664 | APRYL TOPIAH | 2/14/2022 | |||||||
MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC vs APRYL TOPIAH | |||||||||
21CVF03261 | JESSICA MCCREARY | 2/14/2022 | |||||||
MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC vs JESSICA MCCREARY | |||||||||
21CVF03751 | TYLER DAHLINGHAUS | 2/14/2022 | |||||||
MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC vs TYLER DAHLINGHAUS | |||||||||
21CVF03541 | SUCRE LARRAGOITY-LIZARDO | 2/11/2022 | |||||||
JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A. vs SUCRE LARRAGOITY-LIZARDO | |||||||||
21CVF03710 | ROBERT KNEPPLER & SIERRA SHADE | 2/10/2022 | |||||||
PATHFINDER REALTY INC vs ROBERT KNEPPLER & SIERRA SHADE | |||||||||
21CVF03346 | DOUG REID | 2/9/2022 | |||||||
MEDICAL SERVICE CO./PROCAIR (BRIGHTREE) vs DOUG REID | |||||||||
21CVF03723 | BRYAN BLACKFORD | 2/9/2022 | |||||||
DAYTON GASTROENTEROLOGY INC vs BRYAN BLACKFORD | |||||||||
21CVF03688 | ANDREW COX | 2/9/2022 | |||||||
BYRIDER FINANCE LLC vs ANDREW COX | |||||||||
21CVF03232 | HUNTER HOTTINGER | 2/9/2022 | |||||||
BYRIDER FINANCE, LLC vs HUNTER HOTTINGER | |||||||||
21CVF03227 | HEATHER MEERHOFF | 2/9/2022 | |||||||
BYRIDER FINANCE, LLC vs HEATHER MEERHOFF | |||||||||
21CVF03230 | SHAINTAI CARTER | 2/9/2022 | |||||||
BYRIDER FINANCE, LLC vs SHAINTAI CARTER | |||||||||
21CVF03768 | CURT DINSMOOR & REBECCA DINSMOOR | 2/9/2022 | |||||||
FIFTH THIRD BANK, N.A. C/O ZWICKER & ASSOCIATES, P.C. vs CURT DINSMOOR & REBECCA DINS... | |||||||||
20CVF03674 | VINCENT INGALLS | 2/9/2022 | |||||||
THE MEADOWS LAW FIRM vs VINCENT INGALLS | |||||||||
21CVF02900 | JOSEPH FORINASH | 2/8/2022 | |||||||
LVNV FUNDING LLC vs JOSEPH FORINASH | |||||||||
21CVF03280 | NICHOLAS B COOK | 2/8/2022 | |||||||
TRIHEALTH INC C/O RACHEL J MASON vs NICHOLAS B COOK | |||||||||
21CVF02783 | CARLA OLIVER | 2/8/2022 | |||||||
LVNV FUNDING LLC vs CARLA OLIVER | |||||||||
21CVF02889 | BRANDON WHEASLER | 2/8/2022 | |||||||
LVNV FUNDING LLC vs BRANDON WHEASLER | |||||||||
21CVF03083 | CARLEEN THORNTON | 2/8/2022 | |||||||
LVNV FUNDING LLC vs CARLEEN THORNTON | |||||||||
21CVF02764 | JAQUALLA DUNSON | 2/8/2022 | |||||||
LVNV FUNDING LLC vs JAQUALLA DUNSON | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 324, 325, 326 ... 810, 811, 812 Next |