17324 Cases | Kettering Municipal Assignments
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
19CVG02341 | VITO TRAVERSA | 3/5/2019 | |||||||
RON WAKER vs VITO TRAVERSA | |||||||||
19CVG02293 | RICHARD GERMANN | 3/5/2019 | |||||||
PAULSON PROPERTIES LLC vs RICHARD GERMANN | |||||||||
18CVF02915 | STEVEN COLLETTI AND WORLD AUTO IMPORTS, LLC COLLET... | 3/5/2019 | |||||||
NICHOLAS CRAMER vs STEVEN COLLETTI and WORLD AUTO IMPORTS, LLC COLLET... | |||||||||
18CVF02323 | BRANDON P WILSON | 3/5/2019 | |||||||
CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. vs BRANDON P WILSON | |||||||||
19CVL00001 | STELLAR PROPERTY MGMNT | 3/5/2019 | |||||||
LEEVETTE CUMMINGS vs STELLAR PROPERTY MGMNT | |||||||||
19CVI02173 | DWAYNE CARL JR. | 3/5/2019 | |||||||
DERRICK HAMM vs DWAYNE CARL Jr. | |||||||||
18CVI04050 | MORRIS FURNITURE COMPANY | 3/5/2019 | |||||||
GABRIELE RUISINGER-MUELLER vs MORRIS FURNITURE COMPANY | |||||||||
19CVI02026 | CASEY RENTAL PROPERTIES | 3/5/2019 | |||||||
STACEY GOSSETT vs CASEY RENTAL PROPERTIES | |||||||||
19CVG02337 | CONNOR HARRIS | 3/5/2019 | |||||||
BRG REALTY GROUP, LLC AGT FOR ROSELAWN CENTER, LP vs CONNOR HARRIS | |||||||||
18CVF03865 | EVA COTTEN | 3/4/2019 | |||||||
CAPITAL ONE BANK C/O LYONS, DOUGHTY & VELDHUIS P. vs EVA COTTEN | |||||||||
19CVV00010 | DON PETIT OHIO DEPT OF MOTOR VEHICLES | 3/1/2019 | |||||||
KAYLA A NAGEL vs DON PETIT OHIO DEPT OF MOTOR VEHICLES | |||||||||
18CVG03287 | JOHN FRICK AND TRACY TUCKER AND TT'S SERVICES OF D... | 2/28/2019 | |||||||
GREENWOOD PROPERTY MANAGEMENT and MANCO PROPERTY SERVICES vs JOHN FRICK and TRACY TUC... | |||||||||
18CVF02614 | CLIFFORD WOOLFORK | 2/27/2019 | |||||||
HS FINANCIAL GROUP, LLCÂ vs CLIFFORD WOOLFORK | |||||||||
18CVF02606 | RICHARD WALTON | 2/27/2019 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLCÂ vs RICHARD WALTON | |||||||||
18CVV00115 | BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES DON PETIT, REGISTRAR | 2/27/2019 | |||||||
JUSTIN BARBARINO vs BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES DON PETIT, REGISTRAR | |||||||||
18CVF03588 | DARIN SNYDER | 2/26/2019 | |||||||
DNF ASSOCIATES LLCÂ vs DARIN SNYDER | |||||||||
18CVF03523 | JIMMY HOSHUE | 2/26/2019 | |||||||
SECOND ROUND SUB, LLCÂ vs JIMMY HOSHUE | |||||||||
18CVF03849 | TERRENCE STEVENSON | 2/26/2019 | |||||||
CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. vs TERRENCE STEVENSON | |||||||||
18CVF02827 | COLDBEAR LOGISTICS, LLC C/O CORPORATION SRVCS CO | 2/26/2019 | |||||||
ARA EXPRESS, INCÂ vs COLDBEAR LOGISTICS, LLC C/O CORPORATION SRVCS CO | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 747, 748, 749 ... 865, 866, 867 Next |