17349 Cases | Kettering Municipal Assignments
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
19CVF02927 | WILLIAM R CONN & JULIE L CONN | 8/12/2019 | |||||||
CITY OF KETTERINGÂ vs WILLIAM R CONN & JULIE L CONN | |||||||||
19CVF02356 | VERONIKA B TREVINO | 8/12/2019 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LÂ vs VERONIKA B TREVINO | |||||||||
19CVF02345 | TIMOTHY NICOLL | 8/9/2019 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLCÂ vs TIMOTHY NICOLL | |||||||||
19CVF02218 | JOY NEWKIRK | 8/9/2019 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLCÂ vs JOY NEWKIRK | |||||||||
19CVF02213 | LEON SELLARS | 8/8/2019 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLCÂ vs LEON SELLARS | |||||||||
18CVF03666 | CHELSEA SILER | 8/8/2019 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLCÂ vs CHELSEA SILER | |||||||||
19CVF02344 | KANDI BROADUS | 8/8/2019 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLCÂ vs KANDI BROADUS | |||||||||
19CVF03319 | TIFFANY DAVIS | 8/8/2019 | |||||||
CONVERGENCE ACQUISITIONS LLCÂ vs TIFFANY DAVIS | |||||||||
19CVI02860 | CEME PROPERTIES, LLCÂ | 8/8/2019 | |||||||
LINDA GRACE ALLEN vs CEME PROPERTIES, LLCÂ | |||||||||
19CVF02592 | MICHEL BUXTON | 8/8/2019 | |||||||
CROWN ASSET MANAGEMENT LLCÂ vs MICHEL BUXTON | |||||||||
19CVF02591 | MICHEL BUXTON | 8/8/2019 | |||||||
CROWN ASSET MANAGEMENT LLCÂ vs MICHEL BUXTON | |||||||||
19CVF02296 | CHARLEEN ADAMS | 8/7/2019 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC vs CHARLEEN ADAMS | |||||||||
19CVF02343 | WILLIAM WHEELER | 8/7/2019 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC vs WILLIAM WHEELER | |||||||||
19CVF02614 | KENNETH E HISLE | 8/7/2019 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LL vs KENNETH E HISLE | |||||||||
19CVF02070 | THOMAS E CLINGNER | 8/7/2019 | |||||||
FORSYTHE FINANCE, LLC vs THOMAS E CLINGNER | |||||||||
19CVF02319 | BRANDY N JENSEN | 8/7/2019 | |||||||
CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. vs BRANDY N JENSEN | |||||||||
19CVF02548 | STEVE WILT | 8/7/2019 | |||||||
CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. vs STEVE WILT | |||||||||
19CVF02558 | HEATHER NICOL | 8/7/2019 | |||||||
CAPITAL ONE BANK C/O LYONS, DOUGHTY & VELDHUIS P. vs HEATHER NICOL | |||||||||
18CVF02599 | MARY E AUNSPAW AND SCOTT ANDRUS AND PAMELA ANDRUS | 8/6/2019 | |||||||
ANTHONY LEET vs MARY E AUNSPAW and SCOTT ANDRUS and PAMELA ANDRUS | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 691, 692, 693 ... 866, 867, 868 Next |