17349 Cases | Kettering Municipal Assignments
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
19CVE03323 | ALLSTATE FIRE & CASUALTY INSURAN COMPANY AND DONAL... | 9/30/2019 | |||||||
JERRY D HAWTHORNE (EXECUTOR OF ESTATE) vs ALLSTATE FIRE & CASUALTY INSURAN COMPANY an... | |||||||||
19CVF03307 | PATRICIA PIPER | 9/27/2019 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSN. LLC vs PATRICIA PIPER | |||||||||
19CVF02768 | JUSTIN D JETT | 9/27/2019 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOC., LLC vs JUSTIN D JETT | |||||||||
18CVF03874 | AMANDA HILL | 9/27/2019 | |||||||
CAVALRY SPV I, LLC vs AMANDA HILL | |||||||||
19CVF02980 | MICHAEL ANTHONY CATTRELLE | 9/27/2019 | |||||||
BARCLAYS BANK DELAWARE vs MICHAEL ANTHONY CATTRELLE | |||||||||
18CVG02380 | MARCUS D COLEMAN (A685780) AND INDEPENDENT CREATIO... | 9/27/2019 | |||||||
MORAINE AIR PARK INC. vs MARCUS D COLEMAN (A685780) and INDEPENDENT CREATIO... | |||||||||
19CVF02968 | CHRIS COUCH | 9/26/2019 | |||||||
IRMA GOHEEN vs CHRIS COUCH | |||||||||
19CVF02931 | GLENN HOPPER | 9/26/2019 | |||||||
CBCS vs GLENN HOPPER | |||||||||
19CVF03028 | TERESA A STRINGFIELD | 9/25/2019 | |||||||
CROWN ASSET MANAGEMENT, LLC vs TERESA A STRINGFIELD | |||||||||
19CVF03086 | JOHN HARRIS | 9/25/2019 | |||||||
SYNCHRONY BANK vs JOHN HARRIS | |||||||||
19CVF03330 | APRIL D FREDERICK | 9/25/2019 | |||||||
CBCS vs APRIL D FREDERICK | |||||||||
19CVF02985 | ROBERT CROSKEY | 9/25/2019 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LL vs ROBERT CROSKEY | |||||||||
19CVF02965 | WOLFGANG ANDERSON | 9/25/2019 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, L vs WOLFGANG ANDERSON | |||||||||
19CVF03130 | CARL A ROMER | 9/25/2019 | |||||||
CAVALRY SPV I, LLC C/O LEVY AND ASSOCIATES, LLC vs CARL A ROMER | |||||||||
19CVF02050 | JAMES A MARSHALL | 9/25/2019 | |||||||
FIFTH THIRD BANK vs JAMES A MARSHALL | |||||||||
19CVF02816 | RONDA A TATOM | 9/25/2019 | |||||||
CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. vs RONDA A TATOM | |||||||||
19CVG02959 | RICK T FADER | 9/24/2019 | |||||||
LISA ANN BACK vs RICK T FADER | |||||||||
19CVF02791 | MARYANN GETTELL | 9/24/2019 | |||||||
ABSOLUTE RESOLUTIONS INVESTMENTS ASSIGNEE OF WEBBANK vs MARYANN GETTELL | |||||||||
19CVF03038 | LISA RAUCH | 9/24/2019 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC vs LISA RAUCH | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 675, 676, 677 ... 866, 867, 868 Next |