26956 Cases | Common Pleas Domestic Relations
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
2024AN00002 | DANNY OOTEN | 4/17/2024 | |||||||
Lisa Ertel vs Danny Ooten | |||||||||
2024DM00172 | CHRISTINA D BLAKELY | 4/17/2024 | |||||||
Rigoberto Castro vs Christina D Blakely | |||||||||
2024DM00170 | ERIK KUSHNER | 4/16/2024 | |||||||
Brittany Kushner vs Erik Kushner | |||||||||
2024DM00171 | MICHAEL WELLER | 4/16/2024 | |||||||
Kathy Weller vs Michael Weller | |||||||||
2024DR00267 | VINCENT KENYON | 4/16/2024 | |||||||
Deborah J Smith-kenyon vs Vincent Kenyon | |||||||||
2024LS00003 | MEGAN CARRIGER | 4/16/2024 | |||||||
Ethan Carriger vs Megan Carriger | |||||||||
2024DR00261 | RANDAL L. THOMAS | 4/15/2024 | |||||||
Sarah C. Thomas vs Randal L. Thomas | |||||||||
2024DR00262 | JANICE D. GRAY | 4/15/2024 | |||||||
Charles W. Gray Jr vs Janice D. Gray | |||||||||
2024DR00263 | CHRISTIAN WILLIAMS | 4/15/2024 | |||||||
Makenzie Williams vs Christian Williams | |||||||||
2024DR00264 | PAUL OMEGA THOMPSON HEFLIN | 4/15/2024 | |||||||
Madonna Monique Thompson Heflin vs Paul Omega Thompson Heflin | |||||||||
2024DR00265 | MOHAMMAD ABU-ALWAFA | 4/15/2024 | |||||||
Eman Abu-alwafa vs Mohammad Abu-alwafa | |||||||||
2024DM00168 | ADAM GABIR | 4/12/2024 | |||||||
Zineb Ousbaa vs Adam Gabir | |||||||||
2024DM00169 | AMANDA DEETER | 4/12/2024 | |||||||
Joshua Dean Deeter vs Amanda Deeter | |||||||||
2024DR00258 | DULCEE MORGAN | 4/12/2024 | |||||||
Jeremy Morgan vs Dulcee Morgan | |||||||||
2024DR00259 | JOSE J MALDONADO-CORDOVA | 4/12/2024 | |||||||
Beatriz Yebra-gaytan vs Jose J Maldonado-cordova | |||||||||
2024DR00260 | MARCO CENDEJAS CARADENAS | 4/12/2024 | |||||||
Gema Cendejas Soto vs Marco Cendejas Caradenas | |||||||||
2024DM00165 | MIKAYLA DUNCAN | 4/11/2024 | |||||||
Andrew Jacob Duncan vs Mikayla Duncan | |||||||||
2024DM00166 | PARIS ALLEN | 4/11/2024 | |||||||
Javon Allen vs Paris Allen | |||||||||
2024DR00253 | CHRISTOPHER FORD | 4/11/2024 | |||||||
Connie Ford vs Christopher Ford | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3, 4 ... 1346, 1347, 1348 Next |