27372 Cases | Common Pleas Domestic Relations
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
2013DR01258 | MICHELLE A KENNY | 12/31/2013 | |||||||
William F Kenny Jr vs Michelle A Kenny | |||||||||
2013DM00676 | MATTHEW L CRUM | 12/30/2013 | |||||||
Tiffany Crum vs Matthew L Crum | |||||||||
2013DR01256 | CYNTHIA L THOMPSON | 12/30/2013 | |||||||
Douglas A Thompson vs Cynthia L Thompson | |||||||||
2013DR01257 | ELIZABETH A SORENSEN | 12/30/2013 | |||||||
William T Sorensen vs Elizabeth A Sorensen | |||||||||
2012DR01101 | HEATHER D YBARBO | 12/30/2013 | |||||||
Mario N Ybarbo vs Heather D Ybarbo | |||||||||
2013DM00610 | CHRISTOPHER M TIPPS | 12/30/2013 | |||||||
Samantha S Tipps vs Christopher M Tipps | |||||||||
2013DM00674 | DEBORAH J SKINNER | 12/27/2013 | |||||||
Danny W Skinner Jr vs Deborah J Skinner | |||||||||
2013DR01255 | LAMUEL D LYONS | 12/27/2013 | |||||||
Joanie A Lyons vs Lamuel D Lyons | |||||||||
2013DM00673 | SCOTT A BRUCKMAN | 12/26/2013 | |||||||
Kelly N Bruckman vs Scott A Bruckman | |||||||||
2013DR01253 | WILLIAM C EATON | 12/26/2013 | |||||||
Jessica D Eaton vs William C Eaton | |||||||||
2013DR01254 | NICOLE L LAWLER | 12/26/2013 | |||||||
Jason A Lawler vs Nicole L Lawler | |||||||||
2002DR00796 | GEORGIANNA M KING | 12/26/2013 | |||||||
Clyde L King Jr vs Georgianna M King | |||||||||
2013DM00672 | LARRY J DARE | 12/24/2013 | |||||||
Stephanie J Dare vs Larry J Dare | |||||||||
2013DR01252 | BRIAN E FROST | 12/24/2013 | |||||||
Yolonda L Frost vs Brian E Frost | |||||||||
2013DM00657 | SEAN KLOPF | 12/24/2013 | |||||||
Amy Klopf vs Sean Klopf | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 1331, 1332, 1333 ... 1367, 1368, 1369 Next |