26926 Cases | Common Pleas Domestic Relations
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
2024DR00261 | RANDAL L. THOMAS | 4/15/2024 | |||||||
Sarah C. Thomas vs Randal L. Thomas | |||||||||
2024DM00168 | ADAM GABIR | 4/12/2024 | |||||||
Zineb Ousbaa vs Adam Gabir | |||||||||
2024DM00169 | AMANDA DEETER | 4/12/2024 | |||||||
Joshua Dean Deeter vs Amanda Deeter | |||||||||
2024DR00258 | DULCEE MORGAN | 4/12/2024 | |||||||
Jeremy Morgan vs Dulcee Morgan | |||||||||
2024DR00259 | JOSE J MALDONADO-CORDOVA | 4/12/2024 | |||||||
Beatriz Yebra-gaytan vs Jose J Maldonado-cordova | |||||||||
2024DR00260 | MARCO CENDEJAS CARADENAS | 4/12/2024 | |||||||
Gema Cendejas Soto vs Marco Cendejas Caradenas | |||||||||
2024DM00164 | MISTI M HEROLD | 4/11/2024 | |||||||
Jhon Edisson Rodriguez vs Misti M Herold | |||||||||
2024DM00165 | MIKAYLA DUNCAN | 4/11/2024 | |||||||
Andrew Jacob Duncan vs Mikayla Duncan | |||||||||
2024DM00166 | PARIS ALLEN | 4/11/2024 | |||||||
Javon Allen vs Paris Allen | |||||||||
2024DR00253 | CHRISTOPHER FORD | 4/11/2024 | |||||||
Connie Ford vs Christopher Ford | |||||||||
2024DR00254 | RONALD MICHAEL BROWN | 4/11/2024 | |||||||
Paule Simone Brown vs Ronald Michael Brown | |||||||||
2024DM00162 | TIMOTHY JAMES HANGEN | 4/10/2024 | |||||||
Cathleen Hughes Hangen vs Timothy James Hangen | |||||||||
2024DM00163 | MELISSA MAE DAHLIN | 4/10/2024 | |||||||
Jeffrey Michael Dahlin vs Melissa Mae Dahlin | |||||||||
2024DR00248 | JONATHAN SHEEHAN | 4/10/2024 | |||||||
Kaily Sheehan vs Jonathan Sheehan | |||||||||
2024DR00249 | YULE EDWARD BONNER | 4/10/2024 | |||||||
Anita Samson Bonner vs Yule Edward Bonner | |||||||||
2024DR00250 | ANDRE E. CALDWELL | 4/10/2024 | |||||||
Tierra L. Webb vs Andre E. Caldwell | |||||||||
2024DR00251 | JON MICHEAL MOODY | 4/10/2024 | |||||||
Patty Sue Moody vs Jon Micheal Moody | |||||||||
2024DR00245 | WILLIAM FITZPATRICK | 4/9/2024 | |||||||
Michelle Fitzpatrick vs William Fitzpatrick | |||||||||
2024DR00246 | NICHOLAS PATRICK HOWELL | 4/9/2024 | |||||||
Heather Lyn Howell vs Nicholas Patrick Howell | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3, ... 1345, 1346, 1347 Next |