Daily Law Journal
28062 Cases | Common Pleas Domestic Relations
Case Number Defendant Date
2025DM00123 KELSEY PERDUE 3/26/2025
Lucas Earnest vs Kelsey Perdue
2025DM00119 MATTHEW RUEBEN OATMAN 3/21/2025
Shau'de Knight vs Matthew Rueben Oatman
2025DM00121 DONALD KINTON 3/21/2025
Chloe Kinton vs Donald Kinton
2025DR00178 JAVONN MOBLEY 3/21/2025
Keyonna Mobley vs Javonn Mobley
2025DR00179 THOMAS E. WILSON 3/21/2025
Kelli L. Wilson vs Thomas E. Wilson
2025LS00006 FELICIA DENNIS 3/21/2025
Abdulrahman Zaghloul vs Felicia Dennis
2025DM00118 MICHELLE RENEE POWERS 3/20/2025
Brandone Taylor Powers vs Michelle Renee Powers
2025DR00175 STEPHANIE BABB 3/20/2025
Christopher Babb vs Stephanie Babb
2025DR00176 TYLER ANSPACH 3/20/2025
Shelby Anspach vs Tyler Anspach
2025DR00177 SHAWN MATTHEW STATON 3/20/2025
Stacy Lynn Staton vs Shawn Matthew Staton
2025DM00114 CHRISTOPHER GALLIHER 3/19/2025
Billie Galliher vs Christopher Galliher
2025DM00115 MICHAEL L ELKINS 3/19/2025
Ashley M Elkins vs Michael L Elkins
2025DM00116 ALEXANDER S YANTIS 3/19/2025
Sarah R Yantis vs Alexander S Yantis
2025DM00117 SARAH SWIATEK 3/19/2025
Reece Palmer vs Sarah Swiatek
2025DR00172 CARMEN R STEINBARGER 3/19/2025
Jody Douglas Steinbarger vs Carmen R Steinbarger
2025DR00174 DANFORD HAK SUN HONG 3/19/2025
Roxanne Naomi Hong vs Danford Hak Sun Hong
2025DM00112 HAILEY NICOLE GREER 3/18/2025
Dolton Louis Wood vs Hailey Nicole Greer
2025DM00113 JEREMY SCHENCK 3/18/2025
Barbara Schenck vs Jeremy Schenck
2025DM00111 HOLLY BOWEN 3/17/2025
Christopher T. Bowen vs Holly Bowen

Previous  1, 2, 3 ... 7, 8, 9 ... 1402, 1403, 1404  Next