Daily Law Journal
28062 Cases | Common Pleas Domestic Relations
Case Number Defendant Date
2025DM00133 RONALD EGBERT 4/2/2025
Kristina Egbert vs Ronald Egbert
2025DR00202 CYNTHIA THORNTON 4/2/2025
James Thornton vs Cynthia Thornton
2025DM00131 SAMANTHA N RUNYON 4/1/2025
John H Runyon vs Samantha N Runyon
2025DM00127 JUSTIN ARNOLD 3/31/2025
Rachel Arnold vs Justin Arnold
2025DM00128 ANITA SAMS 3/31/2025
Gary Sams vs Anita Sams
2025DM00129 JOHN PAUL CLARK 3/31/2025
Darcie Rupert Clark vs John Paul Clark
2025DM00130 WILLIAM EDWARD KENNEDY 3/31/2025
Amy Noel Kennedy vs William Edward Kennedy
2025DR00196 CHRISTAL NUESS 3/31/2025
Richard Nuess vs Christal Nuess
2025DR00198 BRANDON WHEELER 3/31/2025
Heather Wheeler vs Brandon Wheeler
2025DM00124 ANGELA N GLASSBURN 3/28/2025
Jason Sherwin Henry vs Angela N Glassburn
2025DM00125 SHANNON N JACK 3/28/2025
Brandon S Eneix vs Shannon N Jack
2025DM00126 KENDALL LYNN LYLES 3/28/2025
Donald Justin Lyles vs Kendall Lynn Lyles
2025DR00193 SHAPHAN LEAVELL 3/28/2025
Shoni Leavell vs Shaphan Leavell
2025DR00195 JASON GREEN 3/28/2025
Colleen Green vs Jason Green
2025DR00188 DARYL A DILLARD 3/27/2025
Linda E Dillard vs Daryl A Dillard
2025DR00189 GENE V DOUGLAS JR 3/27/2025
Heather L Douglas vs Gene V Douglas Jr
2025DR00190 GERALD E HARRIS 3/27/2025
Loretta Harris vs Gerald E Harris
2025DR00191 JEFFREY S HUDSON 3/27/2025
Emily D Hudson vs Jeffrey S Hudson
2025DR00192 DANNY WAYNE SEIBER 3/27/2025
Fiona Hope Seiber vs Danny Wayne Seiber

Previous  1, 2, 3 ... 6, 7, 8 ... 1402, 1403, 1404  Next