28077 Cases | Common Pleas Domestic Relations
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
2025DM00204 | ASHLEY SMITH | 5/16/2025 | |||||||
Jordan Rindler vs Ashley Smith | |||||||||
2025DM00205 | ELISA NICOLE REESE | 5/16/2025 | |||||||
Taylor Allen Sparks vs Elisa Nicole Reese | |||||||||
2025DM00206 | LESLIE E BORGMEIER | 5/16/2025 | |||||||
Dwight J Borgmeier vs Leslie E Borgmeier | |||||||||
2025DR00295 | DEONDARA SKINNER | 5/16/2025 | |||||||
John Darrell Skinner vs Deondara Skinner | |||||||||
2025DR00296 | GABRIEL URIAH VUONG | 5/16/2025 | |||||||
Ha Uyen Nguyen vs Gabriel Uriah Vuong | |||||||||
2025DR00297 | CHELSEY STEWART | 5/16/2025 | |||||||
Timothy Stewart vs Chelsey Stewart | |||||||||
2025DR00298 | KENNETH JOHNSON | 5/16/2025 | |||||||
Angelica Johnson vs Kenneth Johnson | |||||||||
2025DM00203 | BRANDON GADSON | 5/15/2025 | |||||||
Philadelphia Gadson vs Brandon Gadson | |||||||||
2025DR00293 | BENWON BLEDSOE | 5/15/2025 | |||||||
Allison Bledsoe vs Benwon Bledsoe | |||||||||
2025DR00294 | ELIZABETH ANNA ODELL AKA WILKINSON | 5/15/2025 | |||||||
Christian Edward Smith-wilkinson vs Elizabeth Anna Odell Aka Wilkinson | |||||||||
2025DR00291 | MARIE ADELLE WATTS | 5/14/2025 | |||||||
Lance Alfonse Watts vs Marie Adelle Watts | |||||||||
2025DR00292 | BROOKE GLASCOE | 5/14/2025 | |||||||
Nicholas Eberle vs Brooke Glascoe | |||||||||
2025DR00290 | MATTHEW R OATMAN | 5/13/2025 | |||||||
Shau'de B Knight vs Matthew R Oatman | |||||||||
2025DM00201 | JUSTIN SEVERT | 5/12/2025 | |||||||
Amy Patterson vs Justin Severt | |||||||||
2025DR00287 | MITCHELL DEMOND WEBSTER | 5/12/2025 | |||||||
Lakrysta Michele Webster vs Mitchell Demond Webster | |||||||||
2025DM00199 | BRADLEY A ROUSH | 5/9/2025 | |||||||
Britni L. Roush vs Bradley A Roush | |||||||||
2025DM00200 | JENNIFER A ROBINSON | 5/9/2025 | |||||||
Gregory S Robinson vs Jennifer A Robinson | |||||||||
2025DR00285 | JEFFREY SLONE | 5/9/2025 | |||||||
Miki Faber vs Jeffrey Slone | |||||||||
2025DR00286 | SHEILA RENAE DOLLAR | 5/9/2025 | |||||||
Robert Eugene Dollar vs Sheila Renae Dollar | |||||||||
1, 2, 3 ... 1402, 1403, 1404 Next |