19033 Cases | Mont. County Municipal Assignments
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
2015Â CVGÂ 01158Â W | KATHERINE WADSWORTH, ET AL | 12/28/2015 | |||||||
WOODLAND HILLS ASSOCIATES, LLC DBA WOODLAND HILLS vs KATHERINE WADSWORTH, ET AL | |||||||||
2015Â CVIÂ 01111Â W | ADAM WILSON | 12/28/2015 | |||||||
NANCY MILLER vs ADAM WILSON | |||||||||
2015Â CVGÂ 01156Â W | KRIS STARGELL, ET AL | 12/28/2015 | |||||||
WOODLAND HILLS ASSOCIATES, LLC DBA WOODLAND HILLS vs KRIS STARGELL, ET AL | |||||||||
2015Â CVGÂ 01067Â E | BRANDON SUTTON AND VICTORIA SUMMERS | 12/24/2015 | |||||||
JESSE LUCAS vs BRANDON SUTTON and VICTORIA SUMMERS | |||||||||
2015Â CVGÂ 01072Â E | CHARLES RAETH | 12/24/2015 | |||||||
MARKETPLACE HOUSING LLC vs CHARLES RAETH | |||||||||
2015Â CVGÂ 01074Â E | CHRISTOPHER EVANS AND TAMARA EVANS | 12/24/2015 | |||||||
CHRISTOPHER KOEHLER vs CHRISTOPHER EVANS and TAMARA EVANS | |||||||||
2015Â CVGÂ 01135Â W | LASHAWNNA BROOKSHIRE, ET AL | 12/23/2015 | |||||||
WOODLAND HILLS ASSOC, LLC DBA WOODLAND HILLS APTS vs LASHAWNNA BROOKSHIRE, ET AL | |||||||||
2015Â CVGÂ 01139Â W | JAMES ANDERS, ET AL | 12/23/2015 | |||||||
TRI-PARK HOLDINGS, LLC DBA VOYAGER VILLAGE vs JAMES ANDERS, ET AL | |||||||||
2015Â CVGÂ 01137Â W | SHERWIN GIBBS, ET AL | 12/23/2015 | |||||||
WOODLAND HILLS ASSOCIATES, LLC DBA WOODLAND HILLS vs SHERWIN GIBBS, ET AL | |||||||||
2015Â CVGÂ 01134Â W | APRIL WILLIAMS, ET AL | 12/23/2015 | |||||||
DAYTON SINGLE FAMILY HOMES DBA JEFFERSON RESIDENCE vs APRIL WILLIAMS, ET AL | |||||||||
2015Â CVGÂ 01132Â W | CHARMAINE WILKERSON, ET AL | 12/23/2015 | |||||||
GATED PROPERTIES VII, LLC DBA WESTBROOKE VILLAGE A vs CHARMAINE WILKERSON, ET AL | |||||||||
2015Â CVGÂ 01131Â W | CASEY STECK AND TARA STECK | 12/23/2015 | |||||||
THRUSH RENTALS, LLC. vs CASEY STECK and TARA STECK | |||||||||
2015Â CVGÂ 01074Â W | ANGELA ADDINGTON AND WILLIAM ADDINGTON, ET AL | 12/23/2015 | |||||||
ANGELA MADLINGER vs ANGELA ADDINGTON and WILLIAM ADDINGTON, ET AL | |||||||||
2015Â CVIÂ 01016Â E | RYAN K MULLINS | 12/21/2015 | |||||||
JENNIFER JETT vs RYAN K MULLINS | |||||||||
2015Â CVEÂ 00358Â W | JEFFREY L CASSELMAN AND CHAD SCHMIDT | 12/21/2015 | |||||||
REGINA FULLMER and RONALD FULLMER vs JEFFREY L CASSELMAN and CHAD SCHMIDT | |||||||||
2015Â CVGÂ 01133Â W | SHARRONDA MCCOY, ET AL | 12/21/2015 | |||||||
GATED PROPERTIES VII, LLC DBA WESTBROOKE VILLAGE vs SHARRONDA MCCOY, ET AL | |||||||||
2015Â CVGÂ 01136Â W | JASMINE MOORE, ET AL | 12/21/2015 | |||||||
WOODLAND HILLS ASSOCIATES, LLC DBA WOODLAND HILLS vs JASMINE MOORE, ET AL | |||||||||
2015Â CVIÂ 01015Â E | CHAD SCHMIDT AND TAMMY LAMMERS AND TABATHA SCHMIDT | 12/21/2015 | |||||||
ELIZABETH A WALTERS vs CHAD SCHMIDT and TAMMY LAMMERS and TABATHA SCHMIDT | |||||||||
2015Â CVGÂ 01032Â E | ANGELA ANDRADE AND JIMMY ANDRADE | 12/17/2015 | |||||||
MARQUETTA FULTON and JAMES BURNETT vs ANGELA ANDRADE and JIMMY ANDRADE | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 829, 830, 831 ... 950, 951, 952 Next |