Case Information Date: 10/4/2019 Case Number: Court: Vandalia Municipal Plaintiff: Defendant: Details: Judge: Attorney: 1324 SURREY RD
Docket History Date: 10/4/2019 Details: Date: 10/4/2019 Details: Date: 10/4/2019 Details: Date: 10/4/2019 Details: Date: 10/4/2019 Details: Date: 10/4/2019 Details: Date: 10/4/2019 Details: Date: 10/4/2019 Details: Date: 10/4/2019 Details: Date: 10/4/2019 Details: Date: 10/4/2019 Details: Date: 10/4/2019 Details: Date: 10/4/2019 Details: Date: 10/4/2019 Details: Date: 10/4/2019 Details: Date: 10/4/2019 Details: Date: 10/4/2019 Details: Date: 10/4/2019 Details: Date: 10/4/2019 Details: Date: 10/4/2019 Details: Date: 10/4/2019 Details: Date: 10/4/2019 Details: Date: 10/4/2019 Details: Date: 10/4/2019 Details: Date: 10/4/2019 Details: Date: 10/4/2019 Details: Date: 10/4/2019 Details: Date: 10/3/2019 Details: Date: 10/3/2019 Details: Date: 10/3/2019 Details: Date: 10/3/2019 Details: Date: 10/3/2019 Details: Date: 10/3/2019 Details: Date: 10/3/2019 Details: Date: 10/3/2019 Details: Date: 10/3/2019 Details: Date: 10/3/2019 Details: Date: 10/3/2019 Details: Date: 10/3/2019 Details: Date: 10/3/2019 Details: Date: 10/3/2019 Details: Date: 10/3/2019 Details: Date: 10/3/2019 Details: Date: 10/3/2019 Details: Date: 10/3/2019 Details: Date: 10/3/2019 Details: Date: 10/3/2019 Details: Date: 10/3/2019 Details: Date: 10/3/2019 Details: Date: 10/3/2019 Details: Date: 10/3/2019 Details: Date: 10/3/2019 Details: Date: 10/3/2019 Details: Date: 10/3/2019 Details: Date: 10/3/2019 Details: Date: 10/2/2019 Details: Date: 10/2/2019 Details: Date: 10/2/2019 Details: Date: 10/2/2019 Details: Date: 10/2/2019 Details: Date: 10/2/2019 Details: Date: 10/2/2019 Details: Date: 10/2/2019 Details: Date: 10/2/2019 Details: Date: 10/2/2019 Details: Date: 10/2/2019 Details: Date: 10/2/2019 Details: Date: 9/30/2019 Details: Date: 9/30/2019 Details: Date: 9/30/2019 Details: Date: 9/30/2019 Details: Date: 9/30/2019 Details: Date: 9/30/2019 Details: Date: 9/30/2019 Details: Date: 9/30/2019 Details: Date: 9/30/2019 Details: Date: 9/30/2019 Details: Date: 9/30/2019 Details: Date: 9/30/2019 Details: Date: 9/30/2019 Details: Date: 9/30/2019 Details: Date: 9/30/2019 Details: Date: 9/30/2019 Details: Date: 9/30/2019 Details: Date: 9/30/2019 Details: Date: 9/30/2019 Details: Date: 9/30/2019 Details: Date: 9/30/2019 Details: Date: 9/30/2019 Details: Date: 9/30/2019 Details: Date: 9/30/2019 Details: Date: 9/30/2019 Details: Date: 9/30/2019 Details: Date: 9/30/2019 Details: Date: 9/30/2019 Details: Date: 9/30/2019 Details: Date: 9/30/2019 Details: Date: 9/30/2019 Details: Date: 9/30/2019 Details: Date: 9/30/2019 Details: Date: 9/30/2019 Details: Date: 9/30/2019 Details: Date: 9/30/2019 Details: Date: 9/30/2019 Details: Date: 9/30/2019 Details: Date: 9/30/2019 Details: Date: 9/30/2019 Details: Date: 9/30/2019 Details: Date: 9/30/2019 Details: Date: 9/30/2019 Details: Date: 9/30/2019 Details: Date: 10/16/2015 Details: Date: 10/16/2015 Details: Date: 10/16/2015 Details: Date: 10/16/2015 Details: Date: 10/16/2015 Details: Date: 10/16/2015 Details: Date: 10/16/2015 Details: Date: 10/16/2015 Details: Date: 10/16/2015 Details: Date: 10/16/2015 Details: Date: 10/16/2015 Details: Date: 10/16/2015 Details: Date: 10/16/2015 Details: Date: 10/16/2015 Details: Date: 10/16/2015 Details: Date: 10/16/2015 Details: Date: 10/15/2015 Details: Date: 10/15/2015 Details: Date: 10/15/2015 Details: Date: 10/15/2015 Details: Date: 10/15/2015 Details: Date: 10/15/2015 Details: Date: 10/15/2015 Details: Date: 10/15/2015 Details: Date: 10/15/2015 Details: Date: 10/15/2015 Details: Date: 10/15/2015 Details: Date: 10/15/2015 Details: Date: 10/15/2015 Details: Date: 10/15/2015 Details: Date: 10/15/2015 Details: Date: 10/15/2015 Details: Date: 10/15/2015 Details: Date: 10/15/2015 Details: Date: 10/15/2015 Details: Date: 10/15/2015 Details: Date: 10/15/2015 Details: Date: 10/15/2015 Details: Date: 10/15/2015 Details: Date: 10/15/2015 Details: Date: 10/15/2015 Details: Date: 10/15/2015 Details: Date: 10/15/2015 Details: Date: 10/15/2015 Details: Date: 10/15/2015 Details: Date: 10/15/2015 Details: Date: 10/15/2015 Details: Date: 10/15/2015 Details: Date: 10/13/2015 Details: Date: 10/13/2015 Details: Date: 10/13/2015 Details: Date: 10/13/2015 Details: Date: 10/13/2015 Details: Date: 10/13/2015 Details: Date: 10/13/2015 Details: Date: 10/13/2015 Details: Date: 10/13/2015 Details: Date: 10/13/2015 Details: Date: 10/13/2015 Details: Date: 10/13/2015 Details: Date: 10/13/2015 Details: Date: 10/13/2015 Details: Date: 10/13/2015 Details: Date: 10/13/2015 Details: Date: 10/13/2015 Details: Date: 10/13/2015 Details: Date: 10/13/2015 Details: Date: 10/13/2015 Details: Date: 0/0/0000 Details: Date: 0/0/0000 Details: Date: 0/0/0000 Details: Date: 0/0/0000 Details: Date: 0/0/0000 Details: Date: 0/0/0000 Details: Date: 0/0/0000 Details: Date: 0/0/0000 Details: Date: 0/0/0000 Details: Date: 0/0/0000 Details: Date: 0/0/0000 Details: Date: 0/0/0000 Details: Date: 0/0/0000 Details: