Daily Law Journal

Case Information

11/27/2018
18CVG01523
Miamisburg Municipal Assignments

RALPH HARVILLE and BETTY HARVILLE
SHCONYA GREEN, AND ALL OTHERS


Docket History

11/27/2018

11/27/2018

11/27/2018

11/27/2018

11/27/2018

11/27/2018

11/6/2018

10/16/2018

10/9/2018

9/25/2018