Daily Law Journal

Case Information

11/27/2018
17CVI01561
Miamisburg Municipal Assignments

NANCY JENKINS
ROBERT PFEIFFER, OWNER and PFEIFFER INVESTMENTS, LLC


Docket History

11/27/2018

11/27/2018

11/27/2018

11/27/2018

11/27/2018

11/27/2018

11/7/2018

10/9/2018

9/11/2018

1/23/2018

1/23/2018

1/23/2018

12/5/2017