Daily Law Journal

Case Information

10/9/2018
18CVG03287
Kettering Municipal Assignments

GREENWOOD PROPERTY MANAGEMENT, MANCO PROPERTY SERVICES 
JOHN FRICK, TRACY TUCKER, TT'S SERVICES OF DAYTON LLC, JAMES BEIRISE/ TRUST

MC Administrative

Docket History

10/2/2018

9/25/2018

9/11/2018

9/4/2018