Daily Law Journal

Case Information

9/18/2018
17CVF03659
Kettering Municipal Assignments

BILLIE BRANCH
KEVIN E ALLEN

FREDERICK DRESSEL

Docket History

6/22/2018

6/19/2018

6/19/2018

6/19/2018

6/19/2018

6/19/2018

6/19/2018

6/19/2018

6/19/2018

5/1/2018

5/1/2018

4/24/2018

2/26/2018