Daily Law Journal

Case Information

7/27/2020
20CVH02004
Dayton Municipal

Comtech Realty LLC
Corey Trimble
Eviction Hearing - Knostman

Richard G Knostman

Docket History

7/21/2020
Escrow Hearing

7/17/2020
Motion For Continuance

7/6/2020
Escrow Hearing

6/30/2020
Motion For Continuance

5/1/2020
Rent Escrow