Daily Law Journal

Case Information

7/20/2020
19CVF07450
Dayton Municipal

Lvnv Funding L L C
Paul Brandon
Phone Pretrial

Deirdre E Logan
Anthony J Huspaska of Stenger & Stenger

Docket History

6/23/2020
Phone Pretrial

4/7/2020
Phone Pretrial

2/13/2020
Phone Pretrial

12/13/2019
Contract / Account Cases