Daily Law Journal

Case Information

3/16/2020
19CVF00780
Dayton Municipal

Felice Stoudermire
Anthony L Mitchell, et al
Phone Pretrial

Christopher D Roberts
Kwesi A Seabrook

Docket History

1/23/2020
Phone Pretrial

10/28/2019
Phone Pretrial

8/19/2019
Phone Pretrial

8/1/2019
Answer

7/1/2019
Answer

6/10/2019
Phone Pretrial

3/28/2019
Answer

2/7/2019
Contract / Account Cases