Daily Law Journal

Case Information

10/28/2019
18CVG06288
Dayton Municipal

Bella Vista-Dayton Limited Partnership
Jamella R Floyd
Second Cause Trial

Thomas P Owen of Powers Friedman Linn, Pll

Docket History

10/2/2019
Motion For Continuance

9/27/2019
Motion For Continuance

8/26/2019
Answer To Eviction Complaint

1/7/2019
Judgment for the Plaintiff: Judgment Entry Adopting Magistrate's Decision On Restitution Of Pre

1/7/2019
Judgment for the Plaintiff: Judgment Entry Adopting Magistrate's Decision On Restitution Of Pre

1/4/2019
Eviction Hearing

12/18/2018
Motion For Continuance

12/7/2018
Eviction Hearing

11/13/2018
Motion For Continuance

11/13/2018
Motion For Continuance

11/6/2018
Forcible Entry & Detainer