Daily Law Journal

Case Information

1/17/2019
18CVG05454
Dayton Municipal

Dix Road Property Management, LLC
William Crews and all other oocupants, et al
Judgment: Judgment Entry Adopting Magistrate's Decision

Alexander A. Arestides

Docket History

1/17/2019
Judgment: Judgment Entry Adopting Magistrate's Decision

1/7/2019
Second Cause Trial

11/9/2018
Judgment for the Plaintiff: Judgment Entry Adopting Magistrate's Dismissal

11/9/2018
Judgment for the Plaintiff: Judgment Entry Adopting Magistrate's Dismissal

11/6/2018
Answer To Eviction Complaint

10/19/2018
Eviction Hearing

9/25/2018
Forcible Entry & Detainer