Daily Law Journal

Case Information

2/13/2019
18CVG05405
Dayton Municipal

House for Personal Empowerment
Toni Spears
Judgment for the Plaintiff: Judgment Entry Adopting Magistrate's Decision

Thomas J Manning

Docket History

2/13/2019
Judgment for the Plaintiff: Judgment Entry Adopting Magistrate's Decision

1/28/2019
Damages

11/9/2018
Eviction Hearing

11/9/2018
Judgment for the Plaintiff: Judgment Entry Adopting Magistrate's Decision On Restitution Of Pre

11/9/2018
Judgment for the Plaintiff: Judgment Entry Adopting Magistrate's Decision On Restitution Of Pre

10/19/2018
Eviction Hearing

9/24/2018
Forcible Entry & Detainer