Daily Law Journal

Case Information

7/21/2020
18CVF01229
Dayton Municipal

Credit Acceptance Corp.
Tiffany Brown
Garnishment Hearing

John B.C. Porter of Levy & Associates Llc

Docket History

6/23/2020
Garnishment Hearing

3/24/2020
Garnishment Hearing

7/31/2018
Judgment for the Plaintiff: Default Judgment

7/18/2018
Motion For Default Judgment

3/6/2018
Contract / Account Cases