Daily Law Journal

Case Information

4/2/2018
17CVI06247
Dayton Municipal

Jacqueline E Martin
Mark Donaldson
Judgment for the Plaintiff: Judgment Entry Adopting Magistrate's Decision


Docket History

4/2/2018
Judgment for the Plaintiff: Judgment Entry Adopting Magistrate's Decision

3/21/2018
Small Claims Hearing

2/21/2018
Small Claims Hearing

1/10/2018
Small Claims Hearing

12/11/2017
Small Claims