Daily Law Journal

Case Information

9/25/2017
17CVI00371
Dayton Municipal

City Of Dayton, Taxation Department
Brian Drees
Judgment for the Plaintiff: Judgment Entry Adopting Magistrate's Decision On Restitution Of Pre


Docket History

9/25/2017
Judgment for the Plaintiff: Judgment Entry Adopting Magistrate's Decision On Restitution Of Pre

9/19/2017
City Of Dayton-Small Claims

3/1/2017
Judgment for the Plaintiff: Magistrate's Decision

3/1/2017
Judgment for the Plaintiff: Magistrate's Decision

2/21/2017
City Of Dayton-Small Claims

1/23/2017
Small Claims