Daily Law Journal

Case Information

7/26/2018
17CVF04003
Dayton Municipal

Midland Funding L L C Doing Business In Ohio As Midland Funding D E Inc
Sherry Totty aka Sherry M Totty aka Sherry Toddy
Judgment for the Plaintiff: Summary Judgment

Mia Wortham Spells
Anthony Barone of Javitch

Docket History

7/25/2018
Motion For Summary Judgment

2/21/2018
Pre Trial/ Telephone Conference

1/24/2018
Pre Trial/ Telephone Conference

8/10/2017
Contract / Account Cases