Daily Law Journal

Case Information

9/19/2017
16CVG04996
Dayton Municipal

Fortune Real Estate 888 LLC
Danny R Sargent And All Other Occupants, et al
Damages

Channing M Kordik of Rogers And Greenberg, Llp

Docket History

7/31/2017
Damages

7/28/2017
Motion For Continuance

5/11/2017
Judgment for the Plaintiff: Default Judgment

1/18/2017
Judgment for the Plaintiff: Judgment Entry Adopting Magistrate's Decision On Restitution Of Pre

1/18/2017
Judgment for the Plaintiff: Judgment Entry Adopting Magistrate's Decision On Restitution Of Pre

1/17/2017
Eviction Trial

12/2/2016
Eviction Trial

11/18/2016
Eviction Hearing

10/24/2016
Forcible Entry & Detainer