Daily Law Journal

Case Information

7/21/2020
16CVF05530
Dayton Municipal

Eagle Loan Company Of Ohio, Inc
Kakesha Jordan
Debtor's Exam

Mia Wortham Spells
Thomas M Glennon of Glennon Law Firm,llc

Docket History

7/7/2020
Citation In Contempt

4/3/2017
Judgment for the Plaintiff: Summary Judgment

3/9/2017
Phone Pretrial

3/9/2017
Phone Pretrial

2/27/2017
Motion For Summary Judgment

1/23/2017
Answer

11/22/2016
Contract / Account Cases