Daily Law Journal

Case Information

11/14/2017
15CVG01274
Dayton Municipal

Stefan Woods
Kevin Thomas
Debtor's Exam

Carl S Henderson
Derrick A. Strahorn of Strahorn & Company Llc

Docket History

9/19/2017
Debtor's Exam

5/30/2017
Poverty Affidavit Hearing

3/1/2017
Judgment for the Defendant: Magistrate's Decision

3/1/2017
Judgment for the Defendant: Magistrate's Decision

7/25/2016
Damages

6/20/2016
Poverty Affidavit Hearing

10/22/2015
Judgment for the Defendant:

9/21/2015
Second Cause Trial

8/18/2015
Status

5/14/2015
Eviction Trial

5/7/2015
Eviction Trial

5/1/2015
Motion For Continuance

4/24/2015
Eviction Hearing

4/8/2015
Answer

3/27/2015
Forcible Entry & Detainer