Daily Law Journal

Case Information

10/29/2019
15CVF03618
Dayton Municipal

Dent-A-Med Inc. Dba H C Processing Center
Douglas K Neller
Debtor's Exam

Leann Covey

Docket History

7/30/2019
Debtor's Exam

12/14/2015
Judgment for the Plaintiff: Judgement Entry

12/8/2015
Motion For Default Judgement Filed.

8/24/2015
Contract / Account Cases