Daily Law Journal

Case Information

1/23/2018
14CVF01789
Dayton Municipal

Midland Funding Llc Doing Business In Ohio As Midland Funding De Llc
Scott Stargel
Attachment Hearing

Christopher D Roberts
Kimberly A Klemenok

Docket History

9/19/2017
Garnishment Hearing

1/29/2015
Judgment for the Plaintiff: Judgement Entry

10/8/2014
Motion For Summary Judgment

6/2/2014
Answer

5/1/2014
Contract / Account Cases