Daily Law Journal

Case Information

2/28/2013
12CVG06240
Dayton Municipal

Carolyn Purce
Cynthia Cameron And All Others, et al
Judgment for the Plaintiff: Magistrate's Decision- Judgment

John S Pickrel

Docket History

2/25/2013
Motion Hearing

2/6/2013
Small Claims Hearing

11/14/2012
Judgment for the Plaintiff: Mediated Agreement

11/9/2012
Eviction Hearing

10/31/2012
Answer

10/12/2012
Forcible Entry & Detainer