Docket History
4/26/2024
Judgment: Magistrate's Order
4/24/2024
Motion For Continuance
4/19/2024
Request For A Transcript
4/19/2024
Motion To Stay Writ Of Restitution
4/15/2024
Judgment for the Plaintiff: Judgment Entry Adopting Magistrate's Decision On Restitution Of Pre
4/15/2024
Judgment for the Plaintiff: Judgment Entry Adopting Magistrate's Decision On Restitution Of Pre
4/12/2024
Eviction Hearing
4/4/2024
Answer
3/21/2024
Forcible Entry & Detainer
3/21/2024
Motion To Appoint Process Server