Case Information
3/27/2024
24CVG01100
Dayton Municipal
Dix Road Property Management. Llc
Tamika J Huntley And All Occupants
Judgment for the Plaintiff: Judgment Entry Adopting Magistrate's Decision
Joseph R Matejkovic
Docket History
3/27/2024
Judgment for the Plaintiff: Judgment Entry Adopting Magistrate's Decision
3/22/2024
Motion To Stay Writ Of Restitution
3/18/2024
Judgment for the Plaintiff: Judgment Entry Adopting Magistrate's Decision On Restitution Of Pre
3/18/2024
Judgment for the Plaintiff: Judgment Entry Adopting Magistrate's Decision On Restitution Of Pre
3/15/2024
Eviction Hearing - Matejkovic
2/23/2024
Forcible Entry & Detainer