Daily Law Journal

Case Information

4/2/2019
18CVI06323
Dayton Municipal

George Fletcher
Latasha Pearson-Gregory
Judgment for the Plaintiff: Judgment Entry Adopting Magistrate's Decision


Docket History

4/2/2019
Judgment for the Plaintiff: Judgment Entry Adopting Magistrate's Decision

3/27/2019
Conversion Hearing

12/13/2018
Judgment for the Plaintiff: Mediated Agreement

12/12/2018
Small Claims Hearing

11/8/2018
Small Claims