Daily Law Journal

Case Information

3/9/2018
18CVG00191
Dayton Municipal

John M Johnson
David Farr et aL
Judgment: Judgment Entry Adopting Magistrate's Dismissal


Docket History

3/9/2018
Judgment: Judgment Entry Adopting Magistrate's Dismissal

3/1/2018
Eviction Hearing - Non-Attorney

2/8/2018
Eviction Hearing - Non-Attorney

2/7/2018
Motion For Continuance

1/12/2018
Forcible Entry & Detainer