Daily Law Journal

Case Information

6/26/2018
17CVE04621
Dayton Municipal

Willie E Gavin
State Farm Fire & Casualty Company, et al
Damages

Christopher D Roberts
Kwesi A Seabrook

Docket History

4/16/2018
Phone Pretrial

4/12/2018
Motion For Summary Judgment

4/2/2018
Motion For Leave To File A Motion For Summary Judgment

2/5/2018
Phone Pretrial

9/13/2017
Personal Injury / Property