Docket History
2/4/2016
ENTRY GRANTING CONTINUANCE FILED: HRG- 03/09/2016 @ 11:00 AM
2/4/2016
ENTRY GRANTING CONTINUANCE FILED: HRG- 03/09/2016 @ 11:00 AM
2/4/2016
ENTRY GRANTING CONTINUANCE FILED: HRG- 03/09/2016 @ 11:00 AM
1/14/2016
ENTRY GRANTING CONTINUANCE FILED: HRG- 02/04/2016 @ 10:00 AM
1/14/2016
ENTRY GRANTING CONTINUANCE FILED: HRG- 02/04/2016 @ 10:00 AM
4/25/2014
ENTRY GRANTING CONTINUING TRIAL DATE TO MAY 13, 2014 @ 1:30 PM (2 HOUR STAND ALONE)
6/3/2013
COMPLAINT FOR DIVORCE WITHOUT CHILDREN FILED
6/3/2013
DIVORCE WITHOUT CHILDREN