Docket History
1/11/2016
ENTRY GRANTING CONTINUANCE FILED: HRG-03/01/2016 @ 3:30 PM
1/11/2016
ENTRY GRANTING CONTINUANCE FILED: HRG-03/01/2016 @ 3:30 PM
9/26/2012
ENTRY GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE OF DECEMBER 13, 2012 PRETRIAL CONFERENCE DECEMBER 14, 2012 @ 9:15 AM
9/26/2012
ENTRY GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE OF OCTOBER 2, 2012 SHOW CAUSE HEARING THE HEARING IS CONTINUED UNTIL NOVEMBER 6, 2012 @ 1:30 PM
8/2/2012
COMPLAINT FOR DIVORCE WITH CHILDREN FILED
8/2/2012
DIVORCE WITH CHILDREN