Docket History
6/26/2013
ENTRY GRANTING CONTINUANCE FILED: HRG- AUGUST 20, 2013 @ 8:45 AM BY TELEPHONE FOR A STATUS CONFERENCE
5/20/2013
ENTRY GRANTING CONTINUANCE FILED: HRG-6-27-13 @ 9:00AM
2/4/2013
ENTRY GRANTING CONTINUANCE FILED: HRG- MAY 17, 2013 @ 1:30 PM
8/29/2012
ENTRY GRANTING CONTINUANCE FILED: HRG- SEPTEMBER 12, 2012 @ 8:30 AM
5/22/2012
MAGISTRATE ORDER
4/25/2012
ORDER SCHEDULING MEDIATION
4/23/2012
Order Scheduling Pretrial Conference /Settlement Conference
3/29/2012
Order Scheduling Final Hearing
3/28/2012
Order Requiring Parties To Attend “Helping Children Succeed After Divorce” Seminar
3/15/2012
DIVORCE WITH CHILDREN