Docket History
2/5/2013
ENTRY GRANTING CONTINUANCE FILED: HRG- MARCH 22, 2013 @ 9:30 AM
7/31/2012
ENTRY GRANTING CONTINUANCE FILED: HRG- 08/24/12 @ 9:15AM
7/31/2012
ENTRY GRANTING CONTINUANCE FILED: HRG- 08/24/12 @ 9:15AM
7/31/2012
ENTRY GRANTING CONTINUANCE FILED: HRG- 08/24/12 @ 9:15AM
7/31/2012
ENTRY GRANTING CONTINUANCE FILED: HRG- 08/24/12 @ 9:15AM
3/13/2012
Order Scheduling Pretrial Conference /Settlement Conference
3/5/2012
Order Requiring Parties To Attend “Helping Children Succeed After Divorce” Seminar
2/28/2012
DIVORCE WITH CHILDREN