Docket History
2/6/2013
ENTRY GRANTING CONTINUANCE FILED: HRG- MARCH 19, 2013 @ 2:30 PM
2/6/2013
ENTRY GRANTING CONTINUANCE FILED: HRG- MARCH 19, 2013 @ 2:30 PM
2/6/2013
ENTRY GRANTING CONTINUANCE FILED: HRG- MARCH 19, 2013 @ 2:30 PM
2/6/2013
ENTRY GRANTING CONTINUANCE FILED: HRG- MARCH 19, 2013 @ 2:30 PM
4/24/2012
ENTRY & ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE
3/9/2012
AMENDED ORDER SCHEDULING FINAL HEARING
2/28/2012
Order Scheduling Final Hearing
2/6/2012
Order requiring parties to attend “Helping Children Succeed After Divorce” seminar
1/31/2012
DIVORCE WITH CHILDREN