Docket History
5/29/2013
ENTRY GRANTING CONTINUANCE FILED: HRG- 6/7/2013 AT 2:30PM
5/4/2012
NOTICE OF POTENTIAL DISMISSAL OF MOTION
4/17/2012
Magistrate Order for Agreed Entry to be filed within 14 days
1/30/2012
TEMPORARY ORDER
1/20/2012
Entry Granting Temporary Restraining Orders
1/20/2012
Order scheduling pretrial conference/settlement conference
1/19/2012
Answer and Counterclaim of Defendant for Divorce
1/18/2012
Order requiring parties to attend “Helping Children Succeed After Divorce” seminar
12/30/2011
for divorce, temporary restraining orders and other relief