Docket History
7/16/2013
ENTRY GRANTING CONTINUANCE FILED: HRG- OCTOBER 4, 2013 @ 9:00 AM FOR 1 FULL DAY
7/31/2012
ENTRY GRANTING CONTINUANCE FILED: HRG-11-19-12 @ 9:30AM
7/31/2012
ENTRY GRANTING CONTINUANCE FILED: HRG-11-19-12 @ 9:30AM
7/31/2012
ENTRY GRANTING CONTINUANCE FILED: HRG-11-19-12 @ 9:30AM
7/31/2012
ENTRY GRANTING CONTINUANCE FILED: HRG-11-19-12 @ 9:30AM
6/28/2012
ENTRY GRANTING CONTINUANCE FILED: HRG- 07/24/12 @ 9:00AM
2/14/2012
Temporary Order
1/20/2012
Plaintiff's Answer to Defendant's Counterclaim
1/17/2012
Entry GRANTING Temporary Restraining Orders
1/17/2012
Motion for Temporary Restraining Order
1/12/2012
Order Scheduling Pretrial Conference /Settlement Conference
1/6/2012
ORDER SCHEDULING FINAL HEARING
12/27/2011
For divorce, temporary restraining orders and other relief