Docket History
4/26/2012
Order Scheduling Pretrial Conference /Settlement Conference
4/20/2012
CONCILIATION DISMISSAL ENTRY
1/20/2012
Notice of 90-day delay
1/19/2012
Entry Granting Continuance
1/17/2012
Order scheduling Pretrial Conference/settlement conference
1/5/2012
NOTICE OF HEARING
12/27/2011
Order scheduling Pretrial Conference/settlement conference
12/23/2011
Entry GRANTING Motion for Restraining Orders
12/23/2011
Defendant's Motion for Restraining Orders
12/23/2011
Answer and Counterclaim of Defendant for Divorce
12/20/2011
Order scheduling final hearing
12/14/2011
Order requiring parties to attend “Helping Children Succeed After Divorce” seminar
12/9/2011
DIVORCE WITH CHILDREN