Case Information
8/13/2013
2011DR01420
Common Pleas
Eric G Jones
Melissa Y Jones Nka Fricke
ENTRY GRANTING CONTINUANCE FILED: HRG- SEPT 17, 2013 @ 1:30 PM
John Rion
Docket History
5/30/2013
ENTRY GRANTING CONTINUANCE FILED: HRG- JULY 12, 2013 @ 1:30 PM
11/15/2012
ENTRY GRANTING CONTINUANCE FILED: HRG- DECEMBER 18, 2012 @ 3:30 PM
10/23/2012
ENTRY GRANTING CONTINUANCE FILED: HRG- JANUARY 15, 2013 @ 9:30 AM
10/5/2012
ENTRY GRANTING CONTINUANCE FILED: HRG- NOVEMBER 13, 2012 @ 1:30 PM
8/31/2012
ENTRY GRANTING CONTINUANCE FILED: HRG- NOVEMBER 1, 2012 @ 9:30 AM
2/6/2012
Notice of Hearing
1/24/2012
Entry Granting Continuance
1/17/2012
Order scheduling Pretrial Conference/settlement conference
1/13/2012
TEMPORARY ORDER
12/30/2011
Notice of submission of Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories and Request for Production of Documents upon Defendant
12/29/2011
Plaintiff's Answer to Defendant's Counterclaim
12/23/2011
Order scheduling Pretrial Conference/settlement conference
12/22/2011
Answer and Counterclaim of Defendant for Divorce
12/8/2011
For divorce, temporary restraining orders and other relief