Docket History
4/19/2016
ENTRY GRANTING CONTINUANCE/ ESTABLISH HEARING DATE FILED: HRG- 07/15/2016 @ 9:00 AM
4/19/2016
ENTRY GRANTING CONTINUANCE/ ESTABLISH HEARING DATE FILED: HRG- 07/15/2016 @ 9:00 AM
1/15/2016
ENTRY GRANTING CONTINUANCE FILED: HRG- 03/23/2016 @ 10:00 AM
1/15/2016
ENTRY GRANTING CONTINUANCE FILED: HRG- 03/23/2016 @ 10:00 AM
11/25/2015
ENTRY GRANTING CONTINUANCE FILED: HRG- 12/11/2015 @ 10:00 AM
11/25/2015
ENTRY GRANTING CONTINUANCE FILED: HRG- 12/11/2015 @ 10:00 AM
11/25/2015
ENTRY GRANTING CONTINUANCE FILED: HRG- 12/11/2015 @ 10:00 AM
11/25/2015
ENTRY GRANTING CONTINUANCE FILED: HRG- 12/11/2015 @ 10:00 AM
2/15/2012
Rule 75 Motion
2/13/2012
CONTINUANCE ORDER
12/22/2011
Order scheduling mediation
12/5/2011
Order for Continuance; continued to May 7, 2012
12/5/2011
Defendant's Motion for Continuance
12/2/2011
Order scheduling Pretrial Conference/settlement conference
11/29/2011
Temporary Order
11/29/2011
Order GRANTING Interim Atty Fees
11/28/2011
Plaintiff's Reply to Defendant's Counterclaim
11/16/2011
Order Scheduling Pretrial Conference /Settlement Conference
11/15/2011
ORDER SCHEDULING FINAL HEARING
11/4/2011
Order Requiring Parties To Attend “Helping Children Succeed After Divorce” Seminar
11/3/2011
DIVORCE WITH CHILDREN