Docket History
9/27/2012
ENTRY GRANTING CONTINUANCE FILED: HRG- OCTOBER 30, 2012 @ 8:30 AM A PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE AND A SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ON 12/14/2012 @ 9:30 AM
12/22/2011
Order scheduling mediation
11/30/2011
Notice of substitution of Counsel
11/16/2011
Order Scheduling Pretrial Conference /Settlement Conference
11/15/2011
ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FOR DIVORCE AND OTHER RELIEF
10/27/2011
Order scheduling Final Hearing
10/24/2011
Order requiring parties to attend "Helping Children Succeed After Divorce" seminar